CO HB1416 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the modification of fiscal information prepared by legislative council staff related to an initiated measure, and, in connection therewith, reducing an appropriation.
Title
Legislative Council Staff Initiative Fiscal Summary
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-12 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.003) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1416 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1416 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1416, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1416 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.003) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1416 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1416 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1416, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1416 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-12 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2020-06-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-06-08 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-06 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-06-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |