CO HB1419 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of a cash fund into which money received from pharmaceutical rebates for the state drug assistance program administered by the department of public health and environment will be credited.
Title
State Drug Assistance Program Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1419 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1419 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1419 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1419 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2020-06-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-10 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-10 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |