CO HJR1010 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning recognition of military personnel from Colorado who have served around the world in the ongoing war against terrorism and honoring those who have died while serving the cause of freedom.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Honoring The Fallen 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-02-04SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-01SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-02-01SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to
2019-02-01HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-30HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over to 02/01/2019 - No Amendments
2019-01-30HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to

Colorado State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback