CO HJR1010 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-13 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-13 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a change to the Joint Rules of the Senate and House of Representatives regarding the number of bills an interim committee may request for drafting.
Title
Joint Rule Limit Number Interim Committee Bill Requests
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
2020-06-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-08 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-06-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |