CO SB007 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the Colorado affordable housing tax credit, and, in connection therewith, renaming the low-income housing tax credit the Colorado affordable housing tax credit and extending the period during which the Colorado housing and finance authority may allocate affordable housing tax credits.
Title
Affordable Housing Tax Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-007 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-007, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-007, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-007 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-007 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-007 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-007, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-007, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-007 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-007 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2018-04-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-25 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/26/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-04-24 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2018-04-23 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-19 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-02-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |