CO SB007 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning treatment for substance use disorders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Treatment Opioid And Other Substance Use Disorders

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-007, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-007, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.017 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 20-007, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 20-007, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-26 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-007, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-007, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-007, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment G). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-007, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment H). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-007, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-13 Governor Signed
2020-06-29 Sent to the Governor
2020-06-29HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-24SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-06-13SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Pass
2020-06-13SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Reconsider
2020-06-13SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2020-06-12HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-11HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-06-11HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-06-10HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2020-06-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance + Appropriations
2020-06-06SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-05SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2020-06-04SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-06-03SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-05-28SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-05-26SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-03-13SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-01-30SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2020-01-08SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb20-007
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_007_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_007_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_007_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_007_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_007_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_007_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fa99740cb481cfa587258500000940cd-sb20-007-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/41e7982c72694e548725852a004ddaf5-sb20-007-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/41e7982c72694e548725852a004ddaf5-sb20-007-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4780dc9e07d4bc9d872585370082d9a6-sb20-007-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-007vote59e4ab
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4780dc9e07d4bc9d872585370082d9a6-sb20-007-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4780dc9e07d4bc9d872585370082d9a6-sb20-007-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4780dc9e07d4bc9d872585370082d9a6-sb20-007-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/af824e2e11f8cd0c8725858300737e1f-sb20-007-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d5dded8ae611bb7f87258584007dcf5e-sb20-007-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-007vote637f00
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-007vote621e16
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-007vote624587
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-007vote627c0a
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d5dded8ae611bb7f87258584007dcf5e-sb20-007-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/af824e2e11f8cd0c8725858300737e1f-sb20-007-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/af824e2e11f8cd0c8725858300737e1f-sb20-007-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback