CO SB009 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning providing financial incentives for educators to work in rural areas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financial Incentives For Rural Educators

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-009 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-009 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-009 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25 Governor Signed
2019-03-15 Sent to the Governor
2019-03-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-03-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-06HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-05HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-04HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-02-28HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-02-14HouseHouse Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-02-01HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Education + Appropriations
2019-01-30SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-29SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-24SenateSenate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-01-04SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Education

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-009
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_009_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_009_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_009_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_009_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_009_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_009_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f8c0edc11205da848725838c0077eb1d-sb19-009-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-009vote58f3d7
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ab360ba19cd9e087872583a200034e7d-sb19-009-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ba1934ca99b745a3872583af00537034-sb19-009-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-009vote5b1831

Bill Comments

feedback