CO SB015 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of the statewide health care review committee to study health care issues that affect Colorado residents throughout the state, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Create Statewide Health Care Review Committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-015, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-015, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-015, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Joint - Legislative Council: Refer Senate Bill 19-015 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-015, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-015 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-015 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-015 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-015, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-015, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-015, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Joint - Legislative Council: Refer Senate Bill 19-015 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-015, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-015 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-015 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-015 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-05-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-05-01 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-30 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-29 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-04-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Legislative Council Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Legislative Council |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |