CO SB016 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the methodology to distribute money in the severance tax operational fund after core departmental programs are funded without changing the transfers to the natural resources and energy grant programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Severance Tax Operational Fund Distribution Methodology

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-016 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-016 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 19-016 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 19-016 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01 Governor Signed
2019-03-22 Sent to the Governor
2019-03-21HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-03-21SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-11HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-08HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-08HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-03-04HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-02-07HouseHouse Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Unamended to Finance
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment + Finance
2019-01-23SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-22SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-17SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-01-04SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-016
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_016_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_016_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_016_rn2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_016_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_016_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_016_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ada2a7ebfa7daf9b872583850074fb82-sb19-016-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-016vote5aae84
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/000b4fdefa7e41108725839a0060851d-sb19-016-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4fecbc0e2fe44df7872583b300714bba-sb19-016-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cca3e3a3780d6be4872583b700531942-sb19-016-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-016vote5bd438

Bill Comments

feedback