CO SB017 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the exemption of the department of transportation from existing reporting and transportation commission approval requirements when it acquires land needed for specified highway-related purposes by means other than condemnation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requirements For CDOT Colorado Department of Transportation Land Acquisitions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-017 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 19-017 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-017 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 19-017, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 19-017, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28 Governor Signed
2019-03-22 Sent to the Governor
2019-03-21HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-03-21SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-11HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-08HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-08HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-02-20HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-02-14HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government + Appropriations
2019-02-13SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-12SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-02-08SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-01-22SenateSenate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-01-04SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-017
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_017_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_017_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_017_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_017_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_017_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_017_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bbdea92a126519008725838a0074b236-sb19-017-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bbdea92a126519008725838a0074b236-sb19-017-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7348b3e448d575d28725839b0053321a-sb19-017-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-017vote58e6ca
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/520f88f322e78b32872583a7007b84b0-sb19-017-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d6db81e621970720872583b700533053-sb19-017-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-017vote5bf6c4

Bill Comments

feedback