CO SB022 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning clinical practice measures for safer opioid prescribing.
Title
Clinical Practice For Opioid Prescribing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Adopt amendment L.020 [Attachment B]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 18-022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 18-022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 18-022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 18-022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Adopt amendment L.020 [Attachment B]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 18-022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 18-022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 18-022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 18-022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-21 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2018-05-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-05-03 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 02/16/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |