CO SB022 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning modifications to the Colorado health service corps program administered by the department of public health and environment to expand the availability of geriatric care providers in shortage areas in the state.
Title
Increase Medical Providers For Senior Citizens
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-26 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-022 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-022 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-022 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |