CO SB028 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the authority of licensing authorities to continue to issue certain fermented malt beverage retail licenses in rural areas.
Title
Allow On And Off Premises Beer Licenses Rural Areas
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 19-028 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 19-028 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 19-028 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 19-028 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | Governor Signed | |
2019-02-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-02-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-02-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-04 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-01-29 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |