CO SB028 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning measures to assist an individual's recovery from a substance use disorder, and, in connection therewith, making and reducing an appropriation.
Title
Substance Use Disorder Recovery
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-028, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-028, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 20-028, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 20-028, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-028, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-028, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: This is a conceptual amendment . Align Amendment L.001 with amendments L.004 and L.005 (Attachments C, D, and E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-028, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-028, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-028, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-028, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 20-028, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 20-028, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-028, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-028, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: This is a conceptual amendment . Align Amendment L.001 with amendments L.004 and L.005 (Attachments C, D, and E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-028, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-028, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2020-06-13 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-12 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2020-06-11 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-06-11 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-10 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-06-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance + Appropriations |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 06/08/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |