CO SB032 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the routing of hazardous materials being transported on the roadways of the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hazardous Materials Transportation Routing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 19-032, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 19-032, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 19-032, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 19-032, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08 Governor Signed
2019-03-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-03-29HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-03-28SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-14SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-03-13SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-03-11SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-03-08HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-07HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-03-06HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-31HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government
2019-01-29SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-28SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-01-25SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-01-22SenateSenate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-01-04SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-032
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_032_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_032_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_032_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_032_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_032_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_032_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/40bccdf9cb14f1948725838a0076fe9f-sb19-032-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/40bccdf9cb14f1948725838a0076fe9f-sb19-032-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/40bccdf9cb14f1948725838a0076fe9f-sb19-032-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-032vote5a7898
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0f18a2bb105c4a9e872583ad0066e6b8-sb19-032-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0f18a2bb105c4a9e872583ad0066e6b8-sb19-032-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-032vote5a576d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-032vote6657ce
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-032vote666d1e

Bill Comments

feedback