CO SB034 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tampering With A Deceased Human Body
Title
Tampering With A Deceased Human Body
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-17 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-034 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-034, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-034, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-034, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-034 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-034, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-034, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-034, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-03-16 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-03-14 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-02-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily with Amendments - Committee |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations |