CO SB034 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning extension of the period following the declaration by the governor of a disaster emergency in a county within which the board of county commissioners of the county may transfer county general fund money to the county road and bridge fund for the purposes of disaster response and recovery.
Title
Disaster Emergency Transfers From County General Funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 17-034 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 17-034 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 17-034 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 17-034 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor Signed | |
2017-03-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-02-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-27 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |