CO SB034 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a change in the date by which the statutory revision committee is required to report annually to the general assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Statutory Revision Committee Annual Report

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 20-034 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 20-034 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05 Governor Signed
2020-02-27 Sent to the Governor
2020-02-27HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-02-25SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-02-18HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-14HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-11HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-06HouseHouse Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-28HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2020-01-28SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-01-27SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-01-22SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-01-08SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb20-034
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_034_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_034_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_034_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_034_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_034_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_034_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0d363a042efc0e1b872584f70070c7e7-sb20-034-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-034vote5e9abd
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-034vote590b37
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8a8b886a089ea845872585060074aa7e-sb20-034-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-034vote5a1cd0

Bill Comments

feedback