CO SB035 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning enforcement measures available to the department of revenue for the collection of delinquent taxes, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DOR Department Of Revenue Enforcement Measures Collection Of Tax Owed

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-035, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-035 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-035 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28 Governor Signed
2019-03-22 Sent to the Governor
2019-03-21HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-03-21SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-08SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-03-06HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-05HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-03-04HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-02-28HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-02-11HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-01-30HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance
2019-01-28SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-25SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-22SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-01-04SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-035
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_035_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_035_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_035_rn2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_035_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_035_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_035_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/312a116d941523878725838a007c141a-sb19-035-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-035vote65a022
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9dd48791fa4b18c08725839e00769e07-sb19-035-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7a2a7e7c90b85d67872583af0053912e-sb19-035-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7a2a7e7c90b85d67872583af0053912e-sb19-035-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-035vote5bad50
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-035vote5e8be9
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-035vote5e9b8f

Bill Comments

feedback