CO SB043 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the legal effects that the rejection by the senate of an individual nominated by the governor for appointment to a state office have on the subsequent nomination or temporary appointment of the same individual to or holdover of the individual in the same state office.
Title
Senate State Office Nominee Rejection Effects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 18-043 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 18-043 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.004) (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.005) (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.006) (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.008) (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 18-043 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 18-043 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.004) (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.005) (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.006) (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.008) (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 18-043 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-04-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily with Amendments - Floor |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/06/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/29/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/26/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/19/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/12/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/08/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/05/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 02/27/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 02/20/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |