CO SB043 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning an increase in the number of district court judges in certain judicial districts, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing Number Of District Court Judges

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-043, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-22 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-043, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-043, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.004 severed section B, page 1, lines 24 through 30. (Y: 3 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 1 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.004 Severed Section A, Page 1, lines 1 through 22 and line 31, as amended to substitute "October" for "November" on lines 5 and 6.. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-043, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-043, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-043, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-043 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor Signed
2019-03-14 Sent to the Governor
2019-03-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-03-12SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-01SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-02-28HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-27HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-02-26HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-02-22HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-02-19HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-02-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations
2019-02-07SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-06SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-02-05SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-01-23SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-01-04SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-043
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_043_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_043_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_043_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_043_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_043_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_043_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/18b95c68e93995d48725838c00059a67-sb19-043-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/36ef4b719d2fb67087258398004fddce-sb19-043-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/36ef4b719d2fb67087258398004fddce-sb19-043-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-043vote5f2096
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ad1387939ca4cf2e872583a60070e7e0-sb19-043-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cb0bb7527d975579872583a900550d00-sb19-043-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-043vote59da7b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-043vote5a19f3
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-043vote59e89e
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ad1387939ca4cf2e872583a60070e7e0-sb19-043-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ad1387939ca4cf2e872583a60070e7e0-sb19-043-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ad1387939ca4cf2e872583a60070e7e0-sb19-043-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ad1387939ca4cf2e872583a60070e7e0-sb19-043-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cb0bb7527d975579872583a900550d00-sb19-043-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cb0bb7527d975579872583a900550d00-sb19-043-2-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback