CO SB046 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Boundaries Of Forest Improvement Dist

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Boundaries Of Forest Improvement Dist

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-10 Governor Action - Signed
2010-03-01 Sent to the Governor
2010-02-26 Signed by the Speaker of the House
2010-02-26 Signed by the President of the Senate
2010-02-23 House Third Reading Passed
2010-02-22 House Second Reading Passed
2010-02-17 House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2010-02-11 House Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2010-02-04 Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government
2010-02-03 Senate Third Reading Passed
2010-02-02 Senate Second Reading Passed
2010-01-28 Senate Committee on Local Government and Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2010-01-13 Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government and Energy

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/8016784D229E9DAC872576A80027AF38?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/8016784D229E9DAC872576A80027AF38/$FILE/046_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/8016784D229E9DAC872576A80027AF38/$FILE/046_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/8016784D229E9DAC872576A80027AF38/$FILE/046_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/8016784D229E9DAC872576A80027AF38/$FILE/046_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/8016784D229E9DAC872576A80027AF38/$FILE/046_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/8016784D229E9DAC872576A80027AF38/$FILE/046_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E20386DF552E4C2A872576B900608EF7
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/97EB1CD04E00E41A872576C700699118

Bill Comments

feedback