CO SB046 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-08 - House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Discipline In Public Schools

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Discipline In Public Schools

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-046 to the House Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-046 to the House Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.037 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Add a within existing resources clause (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.039 as a substitute motion for L.037 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.037 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Add a within existing resources clause (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.039 as a substitute motion for L.037 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved an amendment to amendment L.024, page 17, line 35, after "TO" insert "HAVE BEEN COMMITTED BY A STUDENT THAT" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.030 (Attachment G) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.024 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.027 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-046, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.029 (Attachment F) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.028 (Attachment E) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.025 (Attachment C) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved an amendment to amendment L.024, page 17, line 35, after "TO" insert "HAVE BEEN COMMITTED BY A STUDENT THAT" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.030 (Attachment G) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.024 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.027 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.029 (Attachment F) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.028 (Attachment E) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.025 (Attachment C) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-046, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-08 House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2012-05-02 House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2012-05-01 Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
2012-04-27 Senate Third Reading Passed
2012-04-26 Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2012-04-24 Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2012-03-01 Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
2012-02-16 Senate Committee on Education Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
2012-01-11 Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BBB163E9D91CC52087257981007E02EE?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BBB163E9D91CC52087257981007E02EE/$FILE/046_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BBB163E9D91CC52087257981007E02EE/$FILE/046sedu_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BBB163E9D91CC52087257981007E02EE/$FILE/046seduapp.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BBB163E9D91CC52087257981007E02EE/$FILE/046_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/BBB163E9D91CC52087257981007E02EE/$FILE/046_ren.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A2A9E94A6F7EAE93872579B50000DA43
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/FA5E23F0D364777E872579B4008289F4
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D42B8D5BD2997FF5872579B500006F3F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A8D1A56928DBEBE4872579B500009BBE
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/70157B51E2E28380872579B40082BAFA
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6870E3F52E6377E3872579B40082856D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/1CC3BE24EDDE3505872579B50000AE87
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/04CBABD8DAE24CA9872579B40082DFAC
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/EE207B472C2D8ECA872579EA004FA0D2
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/88A8FF833CE9C156872579EA00500FA6
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/217A4EC8E17ABF64872579EA00502840
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/03D51A563328DCF6872579EA004F9454
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/1520ADE59BE3D157872579F2006857E4
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/FA5E23F0D364777E872579B4008289F4
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D42B8D5BD2997FF5872579B500006F3F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A8D1A56928DBEBE4872579B500009BBE
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A2A9E94A6F7EAE93872579B50000DA43
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/70157B51E2E28380872579B40082BAFA
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6870E3F52E6377E3872579B40082856D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/1CC3BE24EDDE3505872579B50000AE87
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/04CBABD8DAE24CA9872579B40082DFAC
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/EE207B472C2D8ECA872579EA004FA0D2
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/88A8FF833CE9C156872579EA00500FA6
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/217A4EC8E17ABF64872579EA00502840
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/03D51A563328DCF6872579EA004F9454
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/1520ADE59BE3D157872579F2006857E4

Bill Comments

feedback