CO SB046 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Dialysis Clinic Authorization Treat Outpatients

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dialysis Clinic Authorization Treat Outpatients

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-046 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-046 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-046, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with the recommendation that it be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-046, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with the recommendation that it be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-22SenateGovernor Action - Signed
2013-03-18SenateSent to the Governor
2013-03-07HouseHouse Third Reading Passed
2013-03-06HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily
2013-03-05HouseHouse Second Reading Passed
2013-02-28HouseHouse Committee on Health, Insurance & Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2013-02-11HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance & Environment
2013-02-08SenateSenate Third Reading Passed
2013-02-07SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2013-02-06SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2013-02-05SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2013-01-31SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2013-01-16SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D6812D2E0EB7313587257AEE00572F10?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D6812D2E0EB7313587257AEE00572F10/$FILE/046_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D6812D2E0EB7313587257AEE00572F10/$FILE/046shhs_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D6812D2E0EB7313587257AEE00572F10/$FILE/046_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D6812D2E0EB7313587257AEE00572F10/$FILE/046_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D6812D2E0EB7313587257AEE00572F10/$FILE/046_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D6812D2E0EB7313587257AEE00572F10/$FILE/046_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/D6812D2E0EB7313587257AEE00572F10/$FILE/046_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/DF61B8C71B93A0EF87257B0400773D70
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CD73F001519EC0A387257B0400776630
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/0C3E83E69BFCBBBE87257B200071A9CF
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/DF61B8C71B93A0EF87257B0400773D70
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CD73F001519EC0A387257B0400776630
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/0C3E83E69BFCBBBE87257B200071A9CF

Bill Comments

feedback