CO SB046 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Local Firefighter Safety Grant Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Firefighter Safety Grant Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-046 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-046 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-046 to the Committee on Finance The motion passed on a vote of 10-2. (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-046, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-046, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-046 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-046 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-046, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D) The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-046, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-15SenateGovernor Signed
2014-05-12SenateSent to the Governor
2014-05-12SenateSigned by the Speaker of the House
2014-05-12SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-05-01HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-04-30HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2014-04-29HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2014-04-28HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2014-04-24HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2014-04-17HouseHouse Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to Finance
2014-04-14HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Local Government
2014-04-14SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-04-11SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2014-04-09SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2014-02-13SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2014-01-28SenateSenate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Finance
2014-01-09SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FABE6EA570FB2F9887257C3000063389?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FABE6EA570FB2F9887257C3000063389/$FILE/046_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FABE6EA570FB2F9887257C3000063389/$FILE/046loc_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FABE6EA570FB2F9887257C3000063389/$FILE/046slocapp.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FABE6EA570FB2F9887257C3000063389/$FILE/046_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FABE6EA570FB2F9887257C3000063389/$FILE/046_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FABE6EA570FB2F9887257C3000063389/$FILE/046_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FABE6EA570FB2F9887257C3000063389/$FILE/046_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FABE6EA570FB2F9887257C3000063389/$FILE/046_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/AF2B083053EBDCCD87257C6E0079774B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8625626D6B5EFE6C87257C6E007A4BDE
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/729515B9686DCCDF87257C6E00799BDE
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/AB9BDAC95C525DA887257C7E006024D5
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/AF2B083053EBDCCD87257C6E0079774B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8625626D6B5EFE6C87257C6E007A4BDE
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/729515B9686DCCDF87257C6E00799BDE
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/AB9BDAC95C525DA887257C7E006024D5
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/DDA79CFAC2EA0A5687257CB5004FD982
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/AED3BFEC3967CF1387257CB5004FB6ED
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/984168C9D178FF8487257CB5004FC458
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B166F01488E3A0EA87257CBD005FF11B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/5D2D6457E5A459EC87257CC40069E61E
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C8A4D0EE5EA4781E87257CC800677302

Bill Comments

feedback