CO SB046 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Renewable Energy Std Adjust REAs Distributed Gen

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Renewable Energy Std Adjust REAs Distributed Gen

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-01SenateGovernor Signed
2015-04-23SenateSent to the Governor
2015-04-17SenateSigned by the Speaker of the House
2015-04-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-03-30HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-03-27HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-03-25HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-03-16HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
2015-03-11SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-03-10SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2015-03-05SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2015-01-07SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4D7BFC7688B8CEB387257DA4000311AC?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4D7BFC7688B8CEB387257DA4000311AC/$FILE/046_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4D7BFC7688B8CEB387257DA4000311AC/$FILE/046sagr_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4D7BFC7688B8CEB387257DA4000311AC/$FILE/046_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4D7BFC7688B8CEB387257DA4000311AC/$FILE/046_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4D7BFC7688B8CEB387257DA4000311AC/$FILE/046_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4D7BFC7688B8CEB387257DA4000311AC/$FILE/046_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4D7BFC7688B8CEB387257DA4000311AC/$FILE/046_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/FC0AA2496C0B430187257DFF00767425
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C35042E1CCE1CB4787257DFF00767053
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A22AC88A7ECF792987257E13006DB34B

Bill Comments

feedback