CO SB046 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the modernization of procedures pertaining to warrants and checks not yet presented to the state treasurer for payment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modernize Procedures For Unpaid Checks & Warrants

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Finance: Amend reengrossed bill on page 3, line 3, strike "MONEY." and substitute "MONEYS." (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-27 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-046, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-046, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-046 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-06 Governor Signed
2017-03-29 Sent to the Governor
2017-03-29HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2017-03-28SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-03-06SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2017-03-03HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-03-02HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2017-02-27HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2017-02-02HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance
2017-01-30SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-01-27SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-01-24SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2017-01-11SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb17-046
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_046_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_046_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_046_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_046_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_046_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_046_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sfin2017a2017-01-24t140333z-sb17-046-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520Senate%2520Journal.pdf#96
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2017a2017-02-27t133040z-sb17-046-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2017a2017-02-27t133040z-sb17-046-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2017a2017-02-27t133040z-sb17-046-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520House%2520Journal.pdf#387
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520Senate%2520Journal.pdf#360

Bill Comments

feedback