CO SB046 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - House Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - House Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a clarification that electrical inspection fees may be doubled if an application for an electrical permit is not filed in advance of the commencement of an electrical installation.
Title
Clarify Double Electrical Inspection Fees If Late
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 20-046 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 20-046 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 20-046 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-03-14 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/30/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-03-13 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-03-10 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |