CO SB049 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning increasing the statute of limitations for certain failure to report child sexual abuse crimes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Statute Of Limitation Failure Report Child Abuse

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-049, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-049, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-049, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-049, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28 Governor Signed
2019-03-19 Sent to the Governor
2019-03-19HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-08SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-03-06HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-05HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-03-04HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
2019-02-12SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-11SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-02-06SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-01-07SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-049
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_049_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_049_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_049_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_049_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_049_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_049_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e21003064bfa7280872583990072dc82-sb19-049-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-049vote5b1964
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e21003064bfa7280872583990072dc82-sb19-049-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e21003064bfa7280872583990072dc82-sb19-049-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fe7e0717662d1bfb872583ad0074ea67-sb19-049-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fe7e0717662d1bfb872583ad0074ea67-sb19-049-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-049vote5ac57a
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-049vote5e62f7
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-049vote5e78d8

Bill Comments

feedback