CO SB054 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 26 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the regulation of surplus military vehicles for the purposes of operation on the highway, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military Vehicle Motor Vehicle Regulation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-054 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 19-054, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 19-054, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.010 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-054, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-054, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-054, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-09HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-08SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-26SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-04-25SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-24SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-23HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-22HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-19HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-19HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-15HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-04-11HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government
2019-04-11SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-10SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-09SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-03-13SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-02-25SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
2019-01-28SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-054
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_054_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_054_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_054_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_054_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_054_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_054_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/306d93390fa7fd95872583bc006b9cb4-sb19-054-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/306d93390fa7fd95872583bc006b9cb4-sb19-054-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/629eb20bc4062476872583d7004b650e-sb19-054-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/629eb20bc4062476872583d7004b650e-sb19-054-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/629eb20bc4062476872583d7004b650e-sb19-054-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-054vote5f35a8
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1f0679503a3d8d02872583dd007a8b6e-sb19-054-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2ad6b2a8b6e5155c872583e1004d2484-sb19-054-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-054vote57bb2f
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-054vote01dd99
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-054vote01caed
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1f0679503a3d8d02872583dd007a8b6e-sb19-054-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback