CO SB059 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - House Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - House Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning sexual contact between a student and an educator in violation of the public trust.
Title
Sexual Assault On A Student By An Educator
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-26 - House - House Judiciary: Postpone Senate Bill 20-059 indefinitely. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-059 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-059, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-059, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-059, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-059 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-059, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-059, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-059, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-26 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely |
2020-03-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations |