CO SB063 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the recodification of statutory provisions governing the department of law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recodify Statutes Concerning Department Of Law

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-063 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-063, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: This is a conceptual amendment on Page 14, Line 6, "strike 20-___" and add "20-063". (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-063, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11 Governor Signed
2020-03-04 Sent to the Governor
2020-03-04HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-03-02SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-02-19HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-18HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-14HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-12HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-06HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-28HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
2020-01-28SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-01-27SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-01-22SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-01-08SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb20-063
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_063_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_063_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_063_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_063_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_063_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_063_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8f592ebfdaeb0ed3872584f700717cb2-sb20-063-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-063vote5e9ab4
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-063vote590b24
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/dc7f5f9067589c46872585060073d8ea-sb20-063-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-063vote5ca238
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8f592ebfdaeb0ed3872584f700717cb2-sb20-063-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8f592ebfdaeb0ed3872584f700717cb2-sb20-063-2-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback