CO SB066 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning an extension of the operation of the state lottery division beyond July 1, 2024.
Title
Extend Operation Of State Lottery Division
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-066 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-066 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-066 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.001 [Attachment B]. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-066, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-066 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-066 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-066 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-066 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.001 [Attachment B]. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-066, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-066 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Governor Signed | |
2018-04-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-04-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-04-16 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-13 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-11 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-04-10 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/11/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-04-09 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/10/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 04/09/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-19 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-02-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended to Finance |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |