CO SB070 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-13 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-13 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning penalties for traffic offenses, and, in connection therewith, distributing money collected from a traffic violation to the county in which the violation occurs.
Title
Traffic Offense Classification And Penalties
Sponsors
Sen. Donald Coram [R] | Sen. Pete Lee [D] | Rep. Marc Catlin [R] | Rep. Matt Gray [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Postpone Senate Bill 20-070 indefinitely. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-070, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-070, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 20-070, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 20-070, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-070, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-070, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 20-070, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 20-070, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Finance |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy + Finance |