CO SB071 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning expanding the admission of out-of-court statements of a child.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Hearsay Exception

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor Signed
2019-03-14 Sent to the Governor
2019-03-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-03-12SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-04HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-01HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
2019-02-12SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-11SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-02-06SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-071
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_071_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_071_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_071_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_071_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_071_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_071_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/353a37754185270887258399007189a0-sb19-071-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-071vote5974d9
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/353a37754185270887258399007189a0-sb19-071-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/af6c2cbedf182fe7872583ad007d9275-sb19-071-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-071vote604d18

Bill Comments

feedback