CO SB079 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the method of notifying people of Amber alerts to promote the largest reach of community notifications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Method Of Notifying People Of Amber Alerts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 20-079 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 20-079 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor Signed
2020-03-14 Sent to the Governor
2020-03-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-03-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-04HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-03HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-27HouseHouse Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-02-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2020-01-31SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-01-30SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-01-27SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-01-13SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb20-079
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_079_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_079_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_079_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_079_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_079_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_079_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/277832e3832fb53d872584fc0075f30d-sb20-079-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-079vote59eae4
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/293574268f4260da8725851b0071f624-sb20-079-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-079vote5ba2cc

Bill Comments

feedback