CO SB086 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal Gun Transfer Background Check Rqmnt & Fee
Title
Repeal Gun Transfer Background Check Rqmnt & Fee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-086 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 15-086 indefinitely (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-086 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 15-086 indefinitely (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-086, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Reconsider the motion to refer Senate Bill 15-086 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-086 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-086 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 15-086 indefinitely (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-086 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 15-086 indefinitely (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-086, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Reconsider the motion to refer Senate Bill 15-086 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-086 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-086 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2015-03-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/20/2015 - No Amendments |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Finance |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |