CO SB096 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the collection of greenhouse gas emissions data to facilitate the implementation of measures that would most cost-effectively allow the state to meet its greenhouse gas emissions reduction goals, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Collect Long-term Climate Change Data
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 39 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.013) (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-096, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-096, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-096, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.003) (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-096, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 19-096, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 19-096, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 39 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.013) (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-096, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-096, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-096, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.003) (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-096, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 19-096, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 19-096, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2019-05-02 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-05-01 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-05-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-25 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-04-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |