CO SB097 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning allowing a law-abiding person to carry a concealed handgun without a permit, and, in connection therewith, preserving current laws restricting the carrying of concealed handguns on certain property including public schools and reducing an appropriation.
Title
Concealed Handgun Carry With No Permit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 18-097 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 18-097 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-097, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 18-097 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 18-097 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-097, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 18-097 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 03/08/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/05/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |