CO SB097 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the treatment of a marijuana-licensee-owned business that provides employment services to a commonly controlled marijuana business as a single employing unit.
Title
Unemployment Insurance Marijuana-licensed Business
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Postpone Senate Bill 20-097 indefinitely. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 20-097 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 20-097 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Postpone Indefinitely |
2020-02-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |