CO SB100 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the creation of the "Uniform Civil Remedies for Unauthorized Disclosure of Intimate Images Act".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unauthorized Disclosure Of Intimate Images Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-100, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-100, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-100, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-100, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08 Governor Signed
2019-03-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-03-29HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-03-28SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-20SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-03-19SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-03-15HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-14HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-12HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-03-11HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-05HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
2019-02-12SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-11SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-02-06SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-01-23SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-100
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_100_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_100_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_100_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_100_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_100_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_100_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0c814f294b7ff77a8725839900717846-sb19-100-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0c814f294b7ff77a8725839900717846-sb19-100-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0c814f294b7ff77a8725839900717846-sb19-100-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-100vote5974d0
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f94367732b936d58872583b400730bad-sb19-100-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f94367732b936d58872583b400730bad-sb19-100-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-100vote55b03f
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-100vote5686de
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-100vote566e33

Bill Comments

feedback