CO SB102 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning permitting a public school to include operation as a community school in its innovation plan.
Title
Innovation School Operating As A Community School
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-102, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-102, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-102 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-102, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-102, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-102 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Governor Signed | |
2019-03-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-03-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-03-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |