CO SB103 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning implementing research-based early learning strategies as corrective actions in the public elementary and secondary education accountability system.
Title
Early Learning Strategies In Education Accountability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-103 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 17-103 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-103, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment I). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment J). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 17-103, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 17-103, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-103 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 17-103 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-103, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment I). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment J). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 17-103, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 17-103, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-02 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-24 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2017-04-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/12/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |