CO SB107 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning an analysis of prescription drug manufacturer data on high-cost prescription drugs paid for by specified state departments to determine the components of the production process that drive the price of the prescription drugs.
Title
Drug Production Costs Transparency Analysis Report
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-107, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-107, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment A). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-107, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E). (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-107, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-107, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment A). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-107, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E). (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-107, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |