CO SB113 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the mandatory contents of each license issued to a health facility by the department of public health and environment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Colorado Department Of Public Health And Environment Health Facility License Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 20-113 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-113 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11 Governor Signed
2020-03-04 Sent to the Governor
2020-03-04HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-03-03SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-02-27HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-24HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-21HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-18HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-02-06HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance
2020-02-04SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-03SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-01-29SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-01-17SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb20-113
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_113_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_113_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_113_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_113_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_113_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_113_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ae825ba1adfe734b872584fe005d4d6e-sb20-113-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-113vote671784
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5669eddee3978dab872585120062376b-sb20-113-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-113vote5ab892

Bill Comments

feedback