CO SB118 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the transfer of the function of issuing permits for the transportation of hazardous materials by motor vehicle from the public utilities commission to the department of transportation, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hazardous Materials Transportation Permit Issuance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-118, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-118, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 20-118 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-118, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-118, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-118 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-118 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 20-118, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 20-118, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29 Governor Signed
2020-06-19 Sent to the Governor
2020-06-19HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-19SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-06-10SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2020-06-09HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-08HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-06-08HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-06-03HouseHouse Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-06-02HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2020-06-01SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-05-28SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2020-05-26SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-03-13SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-18SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-02-13SenateSenate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Finance
2020-01-24SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb20-118
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_118_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_118_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_118_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_118_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_118_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_118_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/dadc843fd868eeb38725850d00648b00-sb20-118-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7811e562494acc11872585120073adc8-sb20-118-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/dadc843fd868eeb38725850d00648b00-sb20-118-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ebf6e5d8b0e639cd8725852a00509823-sb20-118-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ebf6e5d8b0e639cd8725852a00509823-sb20-118-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-118vote5b1a0b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1a35a15b1c379f798725857c006260a8-sb20-118-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d031a47a415562f78725858100546303-sb20-118-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d031a47a415562f78725858100546303-sb20-118-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-118vote5a81ef
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-118vote5a69e7
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-118vote5a7b86

Bill Comments

feedback