CO SB126 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the operation of a licensed family child care home in a common interest community.
Title
Allow Home Child Care In Homeowners' Association Community
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-126 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 20-126, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 20-126, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-126 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 20-126, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 20-126, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-02 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-06-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-05-27 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |