CO SB128 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning adjustments to appropriations in the 2018-19 fiscal year for state share of total program funding for school finance, and, in connection therewith, making and reducing appropriations.
Title
School Finance Mid-year Adjustments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Adopt Ccr (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Joint - CC_SB19-128_2019A: Adopt first report of first conference committee (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Byd Scp (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Not Concur Appt Cc (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 25 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-128 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-128 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Joint - CC_SB19-128_2019A: Adopt first report of first conference committee (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Byd Scp (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Not Concur Appt Cc (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 25 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-128 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-128 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Governor Signed | |
2019-03-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-03-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2019-03-06 | House | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2019-03-04 | First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Reengrossed w/ Amendments | |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-02-15 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-14 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2019-02-12 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |