CO SB146 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of the regulation by the department of public health and environment of entities that provide home care services, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendations contained in the 2018 sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies.
Title
Sunset Home Care Agencies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-146 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-146 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-146 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-146 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-146, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-146, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-146 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-146 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-146 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-146 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-146 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-146 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-146, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-146, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-146 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-146 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-27 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-26 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-24 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-23 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Finance |
2019-04-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Finance |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |