CO SB148 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the continuation of the seed potato advisory committee, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendations contained in the 2018 sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sunset Process Seed Potato Advisory Committee

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer Senate Bill 19-148 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 19-148 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12 Governor Signed
2019-04-04 Sent to the Governor
2019-04-03HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-03SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-28HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-27HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-26HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-25HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-03-14HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Rural Affairs & Agriculture
2019-03-13SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-12SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-11SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-07SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-02-21SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-148
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_148_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_148_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_148_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_148_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_148_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_148_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c70c28dfb3af5018872583b6007bfcce-sb19-148-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-148vote535d4d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a7f46cff6e535999872583c400621a5c-sb19-148-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-148vote562758

Bill Comments

feedback